|
08/13/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 202, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2356.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1876.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1441.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|