Assembly | 02/01/2016 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2015 | Reconsideration granted. (Page 1582.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 27. Noes 32. Page 1454.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 7). | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |