Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 14). | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2015 | Read first time. To print. |