LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB842
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB842
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB842
Action History
Assembly
06/02/2015
From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Assembly
05/06/2015
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Assembly
03/16/2015
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
Assembly
02/27/2015
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
Assembly
02/26/2015
Read first time. To print.