California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB849 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015