California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB852 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill June 15, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015