Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1789.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|