California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB856 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2015

Amended

Bill July 2, 2015
Bill April 9, 2015