California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB858 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill July 1, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015