Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2016
|
Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|