California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB861 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Amended

Bill September 3, 2015
Bill May 12, 2015
Bill April 30, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015