California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB868 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/14/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 868CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 86 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 14, 2015 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 14, 2015 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 25, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 7, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Obernolte FEBRUARY 26, 2015 An act to amend Sections 20588 and 31657 of the Government Code, relating to public employees' retirement. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 868, Obernolte. Public Employees' Retirement System: contracting agencies: transfer of membership. Existing law authorizes public agencies to contract with the Board of Administration of the Public Employees' Retirement System to have their employees become members of the Public Employees' Retirement System (PERS). Existing law, with respect to the Counties of Kern, Los Angeles, and Orange, permits the board to enter into an agreement with the contracting agency's board of retirement for termination of the contracting agency's participation in PERS and inclusion of the agency's employees in the retirement system of the city or county, if specified requirements are met, with respect to certain safety members, including firefighters. The County Employees Retirement Law of 1937 establishes a corresponding authority for accepting these people as members for retirement systems created pursuant to its provisions, and granting them service credit for their service credited by PERS. This bill would expand the application of the provisions described above to the County of San Bernardino. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 20588 of the Government Code is amended to read: 20588. (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of this article, the board may, pursuant to this section and Section 31657, enter into an agreement with the board of retirement of a county maintaining a county retirement system, for termination of participation of a public agency whose contract has been in effect for at least five years in this system or the state with respect to certain safety members who have ceased to be employed by the public agency or the state and have been employed by a county, fire authority, or district as a result of a transfer of firefighting or law enforcement functions from the public agency or the state to the county, fire authority, or district and inclusion of the former public agency employees in that county retirement system. (b) The agreement shall contain provisions the board finds necessary to protect the interests of this system, including provisions for determination of the amount, time, and manner of transfer of cash or securities, or both, to be transferred to the county system representing the actuarial value of the interests in the retirement fund of the public agency or the state and the transferred employees by reason of accumulated contributions credited to that public agency or the state and the employees transferred. The agreement may also contain any other provisions that the board deems necessary to address issues related to the transfer, including, but not limited to, benefits subject to an outstanding domestic relations order and benefits subject to a lien. The agreement shall apply only to employees who are employed by the county or district on the effective date of the agreement. (c) All liability of this system with respect to the members transferred under that agreement shall cease and shall become the liability of the county retirement system as of the date of transfer specified in the agreement. Liability of the county retirement system shall be for payment of benefits to transferred employees in accordance with Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 31450) of Part 3 of Division 4 of Title 3. (d) Any member transferred who becomes a member of a county retirement system upon that transfer date shall be subject to provisions of this part and of Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 31450) of Part 3 of Division 4 of Title 3 extending rights to a member or subjecting him or her to limitations because of membership in another retirement system to the same extent that he or she would have been had he or she been a member of the county retirement system during his or her membership in this system. (e) This section shall apply only in the Counties of Kern, Los Angeles, Orange, and San Bernardino. SEC. 2. Section 31657 of the Government Code is amended to read: 31657. Subject to Section 20588, whenever, as a result of the assumption by a county, fire authority, or district of firefighting or law enforcement functions performed by a public agency or the state subject to the Public Employees' Retirement Law, any person ceases to be employed by a public agency or the state and is employed by a county, fire authority, or district in which this chapter has become operative, that person shall become a member of the retirement system of a county immediately upon entering county service. That member of the county retirement system shall be entitled to service credit in the county retirement system for the service for which he or she was entitled to credit in the Public Employees' Retirement System at the time of cessation of employment by the public agency or the state, without necessity of payment of any additional contributions in respect to that service, when and if all of the following occur: (a) The board of retirement receives certification from the Board of Administration of the Public Employees' Retirement System of the service with which the person was entitled to be credited by the Public Employees' Retirement System at the time of cessation of his or her public agency or state employment. (b) There is paid into the county retirement fund of the county, an amount equal to the normal contributions of the person to the Public Employees' Retirement System, together with all interest credited thereto, which amount shall be credited to the individual account of the member in the county retirement system, and shall thereafter for all purposes be deemed to be the member's contribution to the county retirement system with respect to the service so certified. (c) There is paid to the retirement system of the county an amount equal to all contributions of the public agency or the state made to the Public Employees' Retirement System on account of service rendered by the person together with interest credited to the public agency or the state thereto. (d) The board of retirement elects to apply this section as a prudent means of mitigating against potential adverse financial impact upon the county retirement system from the cost of disability retirements that may be applied for in the future by persons injured while being employed by the county, fire authority, or district after ceasing to be employed by a public agency or the state as a result of the assumption by a county, fire authority, or district of firefighting or law enforcement functions. This section shall apply in a county of the first, the second, the seventh, or the fourteenth class, as defined by Section 28020, as amended by Chapter 1204 of the Statutes of 1971, and Section 28022, as amended by Chapter 43 of the Statutes of 1961, and Sections 28023, 28028, and 28035, as amended by Chapter 1204 of the Statutes of 1971.