Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Pan.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1348.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was reported Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|