07/14/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 87, Statutes of 2015. | |||
07/14/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/02/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1612.). | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 973.) | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |