Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1589.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|