California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB884 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015