Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. Retained in suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2015 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2015 | Read first time. To print. |