California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB893 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2015

Amended

Bill July 7, 2015
Bill June 23, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015