|
01/19/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3145.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2713.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1719.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|