|
10/02/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 436, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 2747.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2312.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1618.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|