09/04/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2015. | |||
09/04/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/24/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 2050.). | ||
Senate | 06/24/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23). | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 970.) | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7). | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |