California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB90 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015