Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on Senate inactive file. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lara. | ||
Senate | 07/15/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/14/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 14). | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1443.) | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 6). | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |