|
09/28/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 339, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2614.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2152.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 1760.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|