Senate | 03/25/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 25). Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 415.). | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 633.) | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2015 | Read first time. To print. |