Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1089.) (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.) | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |