|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 701, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2859.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2871.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2404.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1547.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|