|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 702, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3169.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 5. Page 3172.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 2740.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 7. Page 1632.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|