|
07/06/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 58, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1545.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1440.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|