California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB918 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2015

Amended

Bill August 26, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015