California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB923 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill May 17, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016
Bill April 6, 2015