California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB929 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 13, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 13, 2015

Amended

Bill June 17, 2015
Bill June 4, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015