California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB93 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill June 24, 2015

Amended

Bill June 11, 2015
Bill May 21, 2015