Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Block.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1349.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|