LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB933
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB933
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB933
Compare Versions
AB933 Amended June 13, 2016
AB933 Amended June 30, 2015
AB933 Amended June 16, 2015
AB933 Amended April 7, 2015
AB933 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB933 Amended June 13, 2016
AB933 Amended June 30, 2015
AB933 Amended June 16, 2015
AB933 Amended April 7, 2015
AB933 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare