Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 07/13/2015 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1016.) | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 14). | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |