|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 667, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2748.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2310.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1016.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|