Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2015 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 07/15/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1449.) | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6). | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |