California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB953 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015