|
10/04/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 475, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 2907.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2394.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 1776.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|