LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB960
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB960
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB960
Compare Versions
AB960 Chaptered October 7, 2015
AB960 Enrolled August 26, 2015
AB960 Amended June 19, 2015
AB960 Amended April 28, 2015
AB960 Amended March 26, 2015
AB960 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB960 Chaptered October 7, 2015
AB960 Enrolled August 26, 2015
AB960 Amended June 19, 2015
AB960 Amended April 28, 2015
AB960 Amended March 26, 2015
AB960 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare