LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB965
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB965
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB965
Compare Versions
AB965 Chaptered October 9, 2015
AB965 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB965 Amended August 18, 2015
AB965 Amended June 16, 2015
AB965 Amended May 4, 2015
AB965 Amended April 6, 2015
AB965 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB965 Chaptered October 9, 2015
AB965 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB965 Amended August 18, 2015
AB965 Amended June 16, 2015
AB965 Amended May 4, 2015
AB965 Amended April 6, 2015
AB965 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare