California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB968 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/15/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 968ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 9, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 10, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 4, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Williams (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bonilla, Cristina Garcia, Lackey, Low, McCarty, Rendon, and Waldron) FEBRUARY 26, 2015 An act to add Section 66304 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 968, Williams. Postsecondary education: transcripts. Under existing law, the Donahoe Higher Education Act, the segments of postsecondary education in this state include the University of California, the California State University, the California Community Colleges, independent institutions of higher education, and private postsecondary educational institutions. A provision of the act applies to the University of California only to the extent that the Regents of the University of California, by appropriate resolution, act to make the provision applicable. This bill would amend the act to require the governing board of each community college district, the Trustees of the California State University, the Regents of the University of California, the governing body of each independent institution of higher education, and the governing body of each private postsecondary educational institution to indicate on a student's transcript when the student is ineligible to reenroll due to suspension or expulsion for the period of time the student is ineligible to reenroll. For community college districts only, the bill would delay the implementation of this requirement until July 1, 2016. The bill would find and declare that the disclosure of student suspensions and expulsions on student transcripts ensures the integrity and transparency of student transcripts and the safety and security of California campuses. By requiring community college districts to provide for the notation of transcripts, this bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) At public and private colleges and universities across California, the student academic transcript is recognized as the official record of a student's academic progress from admission until separation from the institution. (b) The transcript is often the only document that must accompany a student in the process of transferring to another institution, and it is thus important for both students and institutions that the transcript accurately reflects the student's performance. (c) A violation of a student code of conduct, including the commission of sexual assault, can result in a student being temporarily or permanently separated from an institution. (d) Significant inconsistencies exist in current policies and practices related to the notation of disciplinary dismissals on student transcripts. (e) The absence of this pertinent information can put a receiving institution and its students at risk, and may raise liability concerns for the institution from which the student transfers. (f) The disclosure of student suspensions and expulsions on student transcripts ensures the integrity and transparency of student transcripts and the safety and security of California campuses. SEC. 2. Section 66304 is added to the Education Code, to read: 66304. (a) The governing board of each community college district, the Trustees of the California State University, the Regents of the University of California, the governing body of each independent institution of higher education, and the governing body of each private postsecondary educational institution shall indicate when a student is ineligible to reenroll due to suspension or expulsion on the student's transcript for the period of time the student is ineligible to reenroll. (b) For community college districts only, the requirement specified in subdivision (a) shall become operative on July 1, 2016. SEC. 3. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.