California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB969 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2015

Amended

Bill June 27, 2016
Bill June 24, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015