Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died at Senate Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2015 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2015 | Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2119.). | ||
Senate | 08/18/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1225.) | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22). | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |