Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 1765.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|