California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB982 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2015

Amended

Bill July 2, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015