Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and V.A. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and V.A. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |