|
07/16/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2226.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1664.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1109.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|