Assembly | 02/01/2016 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2015 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bonta. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |